Global Patent Index - EP 1052342 A3

EP 1052342 A3 2001-05-30 - Roof window

Title (en)

Roof window

Title (de)

Wohndachfenster

Title (fr)

Lucarne

Publication

EP 1052342 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00107760 A

Priority

DE 19921534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052342A2] The opening arm (5) has a spring (10) and a slide shoe (6) connected to the spring and movable along a guide. The slide shoe a roller (15) or similar for easy movement in the guide (7), and also an adjustable brake (21) which acts independently of the roller. The roller is preferably set on the side of the slide shoe which exerts the opening force. The roller can be mounted on an (26) which forms the swivel axis (27) for the opening arm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/035 (2006.01); E05D 15/40 (2006.01); E05F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/035 (2013.01); E05D 15/406 (2013.01); E05F 1/1075 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/152 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052342 A2 20001115; EP 1052342 A3 20010530; EP 1052342 B1 20050216; AT 289377 T 20050315; DE 19921534 A1 20001123; DE 19921534 B4 20070426; DE 50009528 D1 20050324; DK 1052342 T3 20050620

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-11-23 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150430

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140416

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ROTO FRANK AG

- Free text: ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ROTO FRANK AG#STUTTGARTER STRASSE 145-149#70771 LEINFELDEN-ECHTERDINGEN (DE)

2006-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051117

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-20 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009528 P 20050324

2005-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK FR LI

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR LI

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI