Global Patent Index - EP 1052344 A1

EP 1052344 A1 2000-11-15 - Kit for mounting a straight stairway and mounting method using it

Title (en)

Kit for mounting a straight stairway and mounting method using it

Title (de)

Bausatz zur Montage einer geraden Treppe und Montageverfahren unter Verwendung dieses Bausatzes

Title (fr)

Kit pour le montage d'un escalier droit et procédé de montage utilisant ce kit

Publication

EP 1052344 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400941 A

Priority

EP 99400941 A

Abstract (en)

The frame for a stairway has side rails (2) supporting steps (6) mounted at an angle equal to that of the stairway. Each ste can be rotated around a pivot axis on the step perpendicular to the rail and engaging in a hole (5) in the rail. The pivot axis and position lock are formed integrally on a bracket (7).

Abstract (fr)

Escalier droit, destiné à être disposé entre un sol pratiquement horizontal et une paroi pratiquement verticale avec un angle de montée, ledit escalier comportant au moins un limon (2) supportant au moins une marche (6), le plan moyen de la marche pouvant être orienté de façon qu'il fasse, avec l'axe longitudinal du limon, un angle sensiblement égal à l'angle de montée de l'escalier, cette orientation étant réalisée par rotation de la marche (6) autour d'un axe sensiblement perpendiculaire au limon (2) à l'aide d'un dispositif de tourillonnage constitué, au voisinage du limon (2), par un alésage borgne (5) ménagé dans le limon et une saillie solidaire de la marche (6), un moyen de maintien permettant de bloquer par rapport au limon la marche dans la position obtenue par l'orientation susmentionnée, selon lequel la saillie du dispositif de tourillonnage et le moyen de maintien en position de la marche (6) font partie d'une même pièce indépendante du limon et de la marche, cette pièce étant fixée à la fois à un limon (2) et à une marche (6) par un moyen autre que la saillie. Kit pour le montage et procédé de montage d'un tel escalier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/0255 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052344 A1 20001115; EP 1052344 B1 20031112; AT 254227 T 20031115; DE 69912745 D1 20031218

INPADOC legal status


2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110510

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESDJ

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-02-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040223

2004-02-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69912745 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI

2003-11-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-06-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: KIT FOR MOUNTING A STRAIGHT STAIRWAY AND MOUNTING METHOD USING IT

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR LI

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI