Global Patent Index - EP 1052345 A1

EP 1052345 A1 2000-11-15 - Device for securing openings in walls of buildings

Title (en)

Device for securing openings in walls of buildings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Sicherung von Öffnungen in Wänden von Gebäuden

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour ouvertures dans des murs d'immeubles

Publication

EP 1052345 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109124 A

Priority

EP 99109124 A

Abstract (en)

The device includes a locking element (3) which fits between two parts and which is formed from at least one part or is length-adjustable and consists of at least two interconnectable support parts which each have at the ends a positive or force-locking connecting element which can be brought into active connection with opposite parts of the opening (1) provided in wall. A second length-adjustable locking element can be provided spaced from and next to the first locking element so that a larg surface locking member (10) can be inserted inbetween. The locking member can be flexible and/or transparent.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vorrichtung zur Sicherung von Öffnungen 1 in Wänden 2 von Gebäuden mit einem Sperrelement 3, das zwischen zwei Teilen oder Stützflächen oder Wandelementen 4 einsetzbar und abstützbar ist, wobei das Sperrelement 3 aus mindestens einem Teil oder längenveränderbar ausgebildet ist und aus mindestens zwei miteinander verbindbaren Stützteilen besteht, die endseitig je ein Form- und/oder Kraftschlußelement 7 aufweisen, das jeweils mit gegenüberliegenden Teilen der in der Wand 2 vorgesehenen Öffnung 1 in Wirkverbindung bringbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/32; E06B 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/32 (2006.01); E06B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/02 (2013.01); E04G 21/3219 (2013.01); E04G 2005/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052345 A1 20001115; EP 1052345 B1 20050720; DE 59912302 D1 20050825; ES 2244119 T3 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2244119

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912302

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040312

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI