Global Patent Index - EP 1052347 A1

EP 1052347 A1 2000-11-15 - Adapter sleeve

Title (en)

Adapter sleeve

Title (de)

Adapterhülse

Title (fr)

Manchon adaptateur

Publication

EP 1052347 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107381 A

Priority

DE 19922192 A

Abstract (en)

The adapter sleeve has an external curvature (17) along at least one and preferably two adjoining long sides (15) to produce force-locking connection with the square opening. The external curvature can be restricted at the sides by two longitudinal slits (21) running along the longitudinal directi of the sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Adapterhülse zur Anpassung eines Vierkantstifts an eine Vierkantöffnung einer Schloßnuß oder eines Tür- oder Fenstergriffs. Die Adapterhülse besitzt vier Längsseitenflächen zum Umgreifen des Vierkantstifts sowie wenigstens eine Außenwölbung zur Herstellung eines Kraftschlusses mit der Vierkantöffnung.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/08; E05B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/04 (2006.01); E05B 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/08 (2013.01); E05B 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052347 A1 20001115; DE 19922192 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI