Global Patent Index - EP 1052349 A1

EP 1052349 A1 2000-11-15 - Door handle module for a vehicle door

Title (en)

Door handle module for a vehicle door

Title (de)

Türgriff für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Module de poignée de porte pour porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 1052349 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109848 A

Priority

DE 19922222 A

Abstract (en)

The door handle has a bearing yoke (3) for attachment to a door containing. a pivotable handle part (4) with at least one induction coil (12) connected to electrical leads (17) passing into the vehicle. A handle pin (6) on one end of the handle part protrudes into the door and engages the door lock. The coil can be inserted into the handle via an end opening. The handle pin closes the end aperture (11) after coil insertion.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Türgriff für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür, der einen an der Kraftfahrzeugtür befestigbaren Lagerbügel (3) und ein an dem Lagerbügel (3) schwenkbar angeordnetes Griffteil (4) mit einer integrierten Induktionsspule (12) umfaßt, wobei an der ersten Stirnseite (5) des Griffteiles (4) ein in den Innenraum (7) der Kraftfahrzeugtür ragender Griffdom (6) angeordnet ist. Um zu erreichen, daß der Türgriff (1) auf einfache Weise an der jeweiligen Fahrzeugtür montierbar ist und daß durch die erforderliche Ausnehmung für die Induktionsspule die Schwächung des Griffteiles möglichst gering gehalten werden kann, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß das Griffteil (4) und der Griffdom (6) nicht ein einheitliches Teil bildet, sondern aus zwei separaten Teilen besteht, wobei in dem Griffteil (4) eine sich von der ersten Stirnseite (5) nach innen erstreckende Ausnehmung (11) angeordnet ist, in welche die Induktionsspule (12) von der ersten Stirnseite (5) aus einbringbar ist und wobei der Griffdom (6) im Bereich der ersten Stirnseite (5) des Griffteiles (4) derart ausgebildet ist, daß er nach Einbringen der Induktionsspule (12) in die Ausnehmung (11) die stirnseitige Öffnung verschließt und in dieser Lage an dem Griffteil (4) fixierbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/16 (2014.01); E05B 79/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/78 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/77 (2013.01); E05B 81/78 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052349 A1 20001115; EP 1052349 B1 20050126; DE 19922222 A1 20001123; DE 19922222 C2 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150601

2016-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150510

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140602

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2004-03-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SICHERHEITSSYSTEME GMBH

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: ES FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI