Global Patent Index - EP 1052350 A1

EP 1052350 A1 2000-11-15 - Escutcheon for doors

Title (en)

Escutcheon for doors

Title (de)

Schutzbeschlag für Türen

Title (fr)

Plaque de porte

Publication

EP 1052350 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124261 A

Priority

DE 29908486 U

Abstract (en)

The outer shield (1) is combinable with a customary insert lock (3) with a catch (13) and a bolt (14). On the inner shield ( on the inside of the door panel (10) next to the door handle (5) is a rotatable inner knob. A profile bar provided with notches is located between the outer knob (11) and the inner knob and is correspondingly arranged with the rotatably located closure bit in closure bit insert.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Gestaltung von Schutzbeschlägen für Außentüren unter Verwendung von Schließzylindern unabhängig von der Türblattdicke und der gegen unbefugte mechanische Manipulationen resistent ist. Dies wurde erfindungsgemäß dadurch gelöst, daß das Außenschild (1) am Türblatt (10) mit Außenknauf einen in diesen eingebauten Schließzylinder (7) aufweist. Der Schutzbeschlag ist kombinierbar mit einem üblichen Einsteckschloß (3) mit einer Falle (13) und einem Riegel (14). Am Innenschild (4) an der Innenseite des Türblattes (10) ist neben dem Türdrücker (5) ein drehbarer Innenknauf angeordnet, wobei der mit abzwickbaren Kerben versehene Profilstab sich zwischen Außenknauf und Innenknauf befindet und dieser mit dem im Schließbarteinsatz drehbar gelagerten Schließbart korrespondierbar angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02; E05B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2013.01); E05B 63/006 (2013.01); E05B 63/0034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908486 U1 19990729; EP 1052350 A1 20001115; EP 1052350 B1 20010627

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-04-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070403

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900138 20010802

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-07-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI