Global Patent Index - EP 1052362 A2

EP 1052362 A2 2000-11-15 - Double glazing

Title (en)

Double glazing

Title (de)

Doppelverglasung

Title (fr)

Panneau à double vitrage

Publication

EP 1052362 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00401256 A

Priority

FR 9905907 A

Abstract (en)

The panel, especially for a double-glazed window, has its two panes of glass (V1, V2) fixed to a spacer (5b) which forms par the window frame by an adhesive (20) with a rigidity modulus within a range of values of between 20 and 100 MPa and a shear stre above 10 MPa, so that the glass panes contribute to the rigidity of the panel. The adhesive is applied in a bead 1 - 2 mm thick about 1 cm wide. The glass panes are also sealed to the spacer by a mastic (22) or adhesive forming a vapour barrier.

Abstract (fr)

Panneau à double vitrage comprenant une partie support (A) formée par un cadre (3), et une partie vitrage (B) formée par deux vitrages (V1,V2) maintenus à distance l'un de l'autre par un moyen d'espacement (5b) solidaire du cadre (3), et fixés à ce dernier par collage, caractérisé en ce que la colle utilisée pour fixer les vitrages (V1,V2) sur le moyen d'espacement (5b) présente un module de rigidité compris dans une plage de valeurs allant de 20 MPa à 100 MPa environ, et une résistance au cisaillement supérieure à 10 MPa, de manière à réaliser un panneau où les vitrages (V1,V2) participent à la rigidité du panneau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/22 (2006.01); E06B 3/24 (2006.01); E06B 3/30 (2006.01); E06B 3/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/56 (2013.01); E06B 3/221 (2013.01); E06B 3/24 (2013.01); E06B 3/306 (2013.01); E06B 2003/228 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052362 A2 20001115; EP 1052362 A3 20020123; FR 2793515 A1 20001117; FR 2793515 B1 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041202

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 06B 3/24 A, 7E 06B 3/56 B

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010410

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI