Global Patent Index - EP 1052364 A1

EP 1052364 A1 2000-11-15 - Window with built-in lighting means

Title (en)

Window with built-in lighting means

Title (de)

Fenster mit eingebauter Beleuchtung

Title (fr)

Fenêtre avec éclairage encastré

Publication

EP 1052364 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110135 A

Priority

IT MI991067 A

Abstract (en)

A window with built-in light, comprising at least one glass pane (6). which is accommodated within a movable sash (1) which is adapted to be hinged to a fixed casing (2), further comprising at least one light source (7) which is meant to be accommodated in the sash or casing and to project light rays toward the at least one glass pane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/24; E06B 9/40; G09F 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/24 (2006.01); E06B 9/264 (2006.01); E06B 9/40 (2006.01); G09F 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/006 (2013.01); E06B 9/24 (2013.01); E06B 9/264 (2013.01); E06B 9/40 (2013.01); F21V 14/006 (2013.01); G09F 13/04 (2013.01); E06B 2009/2452 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052364 A1 20001115; IT 1312443 B1 20020417; IT MI991067 A1 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050902

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010406

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010406

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI