Global Patent Index - EP 1052365 A3

EP 1052365 A3 2000-12-06 - Operating mechanism for a venetian blind

Title (en)

Operating mechanism for a venetian blind

Title (de)

Antrieb für eine Jalousie

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour un store vénitien

Publication

EP 1052365 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00303940 A

Priority

  • EP 00303940 A
  • EP 99201457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052365A2] An operating mechanism is provided which can raise, lower and tilt slats of a venetian blind, particularly an outside blind mounted externally of a building, and which comprises: a support body for rotatably receiving a rotatable drive shaft; a releasable clutch mechanism having at least a first element mounted for rotation by the drive shaft and a second element releasably engaged with the first element for moving the slats between opposite first and second angular positions; means defining the first and second angular positions; arresting means on the support body adapted to cooperate with the second element for establishing the opposite first and second angular positions; a retractable stop engageable with the second element to arrest the second element in an intermediate position between the opposite first and second positions and a lost motion mechanism interposed between the drive shaft and the retractable stop for engaging the retractable stop with the second element only after a predetermined number of revolutions of the drive shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/308; E06B 9/307

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2006.01); E06B 9/308 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/307 (2013.01); E06B 9/308 (2013.01); E06B 2009/285 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052365 A2 20001115; EP 1052365 A3 20001206; EP 1052365 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170512

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160511

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.

- Free text: HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.#PIEKSTRAAT 2#3071 EL ROTTERDAM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.#PIEKSTRAAT 2#3071 EL ROTTERDAM (NL)

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050529

2006-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-10 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-05-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050409

2005-03-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-03-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017006 P 20050203

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-12-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040219

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI