Global Patent Index - EP 1052366 A1

EP 1052366 A1 2000-11-15 - End cap for fixing a step of a footboard or ladder

Title (en)

End cap for fixing a step of a footboard or ladder

Title (de)

Endstück zur Verbindung von einem Tritt eines Trittbretts oder Leiter

Title (fr)

Embout de fixation de marche pour marchepied ou échelle

Publication

EP 1052366 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401233 A

Priority

FR 9906091 A

Abstract (en)

The rung mounting for a ladder has a fixing bracket (7) with a casing shaped to fit the end of the rung (5) with a small amo of play. The casing has a recess shaped to fit a rounded stile (3) of the ladder at a set angle. The casing is fixed to the stil a screw fitted into the rung and extending through the casing into the stile to be locked with the latter.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un embout de fixation de marche pour marchepied ou échelle, le marchepied et l'échelle obtenus. L'embout (7) de fixation de marche pour marchepied ou échelle, adapté notamment à la fixation sur des montants (3) de plan de marches de section arrondie ou circulaire, est caractérisé en ce qu'il est à forme générale de manchon dont la section intérieure est complémentaire à faible jeu de l'extrémité de marche (5) à recevoir, de façon à s'emmancher extérieurement sur celle-ci, ledit embout (7) comportant en outre une découpe extérieure dont la forme est adaptée à faible jeu et selon une inclinaison de service adéquate du marchepied ou de l'échelle à la partie intérieure du montant (3) sur laquelle elle doit être appliquée, cette fixation au montant étant réalisée par au moins une tige ou vis montée dans la marche (5), l'embout (7) et le montant (3) et serrée sur ce dernier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06C 7/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052366 A1 20001115; EP 1052366 B1 20060816; AT 336635 T 20060915; DE 60030029 D1 20060928; DE 60030029 T2 20070104; ES 2269077 T3 20070401; FR 2793520 A1 20001117; FR 2793520 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD AND SIEDSMA AG, CH

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: COMABI, FR

2014-07-15 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: COMABI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOCIETE ANONYME DITE TUBESCA, FR

2014-05-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140501 AND 20140507

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-05-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-05-03 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-05-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TUBESCA-COMABI, FR

- Effective date: 20130329

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110505

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 336635 T

- Effective date: 20110505

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60030029

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TUBESCA

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60030029

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070505

2008-09-19 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061117

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2269077 T3

2007-03-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-01-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070116

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-09-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60030029 P 20060928

2006-09-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: END CAP FOR FIXING A STEP OF A FOOTBOARD OR LADDER

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040120

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001028

2001-09-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI