Global Patent Index - EP 1052394 A2

EP 1052394 A2 2000-11-15 - Liquid cooled multicylinder internal combustion engine with a releasable cylinder head

Title (en)

Liquid cooled multicylinder internal combustion engine with a releasable cylinder head

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühlte, mehrzylindrige Brennkraftmaschine mit am Zylinder-Kurbelgehäuse lösbar angeordnetem Zylinderkopf

Title (fr)

Moteur multicylindre à combustion interne refroidi par un liquide avec une culasse détachable

Publication

EP 1052394 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108214 A

Priority

DE 19922342 A

Abstract (en)

The crankcase (2) of a water-cooled and multiple-cylinder internal combustion motor has a coolant chamber (5) divided into t zones (5',5). The crankcase (2) has a guide system (10,15,5',5) to carry the coolant flowing from the cylinder head (3) to a ris channel (11) integrated into the cylinder head (3). The coolant chamber sections (8-8') of the coolant chamber (4) at the cylind head (3) are linked at their uppermost points by a bleed channel (12). The rising channel (11) is linked to the outer channel connection (13) to open at the highest geodesic point (14).

Abstract (de)

Für eine flüssigkeitsgekühlte, mehrzylindrige Brennkraftmaschine mit einem am Zylinder-Kurbelgehäuse (2) lösbar angeordneten, quer durchströmten Zylinderkopf (3) wird zur Erzielung einer verbesserten Kühlmittelführung unter Einbindung zumindest eines Teilbereiches einer unterteilten Kühlmittelkammer (5) des Zylinder-Kurbelgehäuses (2) bei wirksamer Entlüftung in einfacher Ausgestaltung vorgeschlagen, daß das Zylinder-Kurbelgehäuse (2) eine in Teilbereiche unterteilte Kühlmittelkammer (5) umfaßt und daß eine im Zylinder-Kurbelgehäuse (2) angeordnete Einrichtung der Weiterleitung des aus dem Zylinderkopf (3) abfließenden Kühlmittels zu einem im Zylinderkopf (3) integrierten Steigkanal (11) dient, wobei eine im Zylinderkopf (3) quer durchströmte Abschnitte (8 bis 8''') in Hochpunkten verbindende Entlüftungsleitung (12) vorgesehen ist, die in den mit einem äußeren Leitungsanschluß (13) verbindbaren Steigkanal (11) in einem Bereich eines geodätischen Höchstpunktes (14) mündet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/40; F02F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/20 (2006.01); F02F 1/10 (2006.01); F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F02B 75/20 (2013.01); F02F 1/108 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052394 A2 20001115; EP 1052394 A3 20010207; EP 1052394 B1 20040721; DE 19922342 A1 20001116; ES 2222868 T3 20050216

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222868 T3

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007104 P 20040826

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02F 1/40 A, 7F 02F 1/10 B, 7F 02B 75/20 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI