Global Patent Index - EP 1052394 A3

EP 1052394 A3 2001-02-07 - Liquid cooled multicylinder internal combustion engine with a releasable cylinder head

Title (en)

Liquid cooled multicylinder internal combustion engine with a releasable cylinder head

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsgekühlte, mehrzylindrige Brennkraftmaschine mit am Zylinder-Kurbelgehäuse lösbar angeordnetem Zylinderkopf

Title (fr)

Moteur multicylindre à combustion interne refroidi par un liquide avec une culasse détachable

Publication

EP 1052394 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108214 A

Priority

DE 19922342 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052394A2] The crankcase (2) of a water-cooled and multiple-cylinder internal combustion motor has a coolant chamber (5) divided into t zones (5',5). The crankcase (2) has a guide system (10,15,5',5) to carry the coolant flowing from the cylinder head (3) to a ris channel (11) integrated into the cylinder head (3). The coolant chamber sections (8-8') of the coolant chamber (4) at the cylind head (3) are linked at their uppermost points by a bleed channel (12). The rising channel (11) is linked to the outer channel connection (13) to open at the highest geodesic point (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/40; F02B 75/20; F02F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/20 (2006.01); F02F 1/10 (2006.01); F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F02B 75/20 (2013.01); F02F 1/108 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052394 A2 20001115; EP 1052394 A3 20010207; EP 1052394 B1 20040721; DE 19922342 A1 20001116; ES 2222868 T3 20050216

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2222868

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007104

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02F 1/40 A, 7F 02F 1/10 B, 7F 02B 75/20 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI