Global Patent Index - EP 1052397 A2

EP 1052397 A2 2000-11-15 - Fuel withdrawing device

Title (en)

Fuel withdrawing device

Title (de)

Kraftstoffentnahmevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour enlever du carburant

Publication

EP 1052397 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108128 A

Priority

DE 19921547 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel supply unit for motor vehicles comprises a filter (8) which is attached to the unit in the bottom region of the fue tank. The interior of the unit accommodates seatings (13, 15) for fuel preliminary run and return lines. The seating (13) for th return line (5) divides the fuel stream into at least two streams (T1, T2). This seating is adjoined by a space (18) which accommodates the seating (15) of the fuel preliminary run line (6) and receives at least the stream (T2) from the return line (5). Guide elements (14, 14.1) are provided for directing at least the stream (T1) onto the filter surface (11).

Abstract (de)

Filter für Kraftstoffentnahmevorrichtungen von Kraftfahrzeugen werden bei tiefen Temperaturen durch Paraffinausscheidungen der Kraftstoffe zugesetzt, so daß eine störungsfreie Versorgung des Motors mit Kraftstoff nicht gewährleistet ist. Die neue Kraftstoffentnahmevorrichtung soll auch bei tiefen Temperaturen eine zuverlässige Versorgung gewährleisten, insbesondere soll das Kaltstartverhalten verbessert werden. Die erfindungsgemäße Kraftstoffentnahmevorrichtung besitzt eine bis in den Filter geführte Rücklaufleitung, deren Kraftstoffstrom in mehrere Teilströme aufgeteilt wird. Indem mindestens ein Teilstrom des vom Motor kommenden, heißen Rücklaufs auf die Filterfläche gelenkt wird, werden am Filter angelagerte Paraffinabscheidungen in diesem Bereich aufgelöst, so daß auch bei tiefen Temperaturen Kraftstoff durch den Filter angesaugt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/22 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/22 (2013.01); F02M 37/223 (2013.01); F02M 37/0017 (2013.01); F02M 37/0082 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19626902 C1 19970911 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052397 A2 20001115; EP 1052397 A3 20010606; EP 1052397 B1 20050126; AT 288033 T 20050215; DE 19921547 A1 20010111; DE 19921547 C2 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110413

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110413

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 288033 T

- Effective date: 20110413

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009325

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2008-09-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009325 P 20050303

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR IT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010616

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI