Global Patent Index - EP 1052402 A3

EP 1052402 A3 2001-04-18 - Starter having a pinion movement control structure

Title (en)

Starter having a pinion movement control structure

Title (de)

Anlasser mit einer Regelvorrichtung der Ritzelbewegung

Title (fr)

Démarreur muni d'un dispositif de contrôle du mouvement du pignon

Publication

EP 1052402 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00116717 A

Priority

  • EP 97109227 A
  • JP 18024396 A
  • JP 20745996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052402A2] A starter (1) has a motor (2), output shaft (3) driven by the motor, a pinion moving body (4) mounted on the output shaft and engageable with a ring gear (29), an electromagnet switch (5), and a rotation restricting member (6) driven by the electromagnet switch to engage and restrict rotation of the pinion moving body until engagement of a pinion gear (30) with the ring gear. Further, to protect the pinion moving body, the pinion moving body is advanced closely to the ring gear and thereafter the motor is allowed to rotate so that the pinion engages the ring gear at low rotation speeds. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/065 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052402 A2 20001115; EP 1052402 A3 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051117

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050706

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-11-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 818624

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT