Global Patent Index - EP 1052410 A2

EP 1052410 A2 2000-11-15 - Impeller attached to a rotor

Title (en)

Impeller attached to a rotor

Title (de)

Auf den Rotor aufgestecktes Laufrad

Title (fr)

Rouet monté sur un rotor

Publication

EP 1052410 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108901 A

Priority

  • DE 19921362 A
  • DE 19921365 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical pump to impel a medium in a heating or cooling system, and especially a canned pump, has a stator and a rotat rotor. The rotor is a hollow rotor cylinder with permanent magnet zones in the cylinder wall, and carries a running wheel at an side. A rotor bearing is within the hollow zone. The running wheel (9) has a positive fit at the end wall of the rotor cylinder in the peripheral direction. The running wheel (9) is in a force fit or positive fit at the end wall of the rotor cylinder (13) the axial direction. The running wheel is of plastics. The rotor cylinder (13) is of a material which can be magnetized, and especially a plastics with added material which can be magnetized.

Abstract (de)

Elektrisch betriebene Pumpe, insbesondere Spaltrohrpumpe, zur Förderung eines Mediums in einem Heizungs- oder Kühlsystem, mit einem Stator und mit einem drehbar gelagerten Rotor, wobei der Rotor einen hohlen Rotorzylinder mit in Zylinderwandung befindlichen permanentmagnetischen Bereichen aufweist, der an einer Stirnseite ein Laufrad trägt und in dessen Hohlraum ein Rotorlager angeordnet ist, wobei das Laufrad 9 in Umfangsrichtung formschlüssig und in axialer Richtung kraftschlüssig oder formschlüssig auf die stirnseitige Wandung des Rotorzylinders 13 aufsetzbar ist . <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/06; F01P 5/10; F04D 29/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2006.01); F04D 13/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 5/10 (2013.01); F04D 13/0633 (2013.01); F04D 13/064 (2013.01); F04D 13/0686 (2013.01); F04D 29/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052410 A2 20001115; EP 1052410 A3 20010912; EP 1052410 B1 20030730

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150427

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50003066

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140408

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003066

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 04D 13/06 A, 7F 04D 29/22 B, 7F 01P 5/10 B, 7F 04D 29/04 B, 7F 04D 29/60 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI