Global Patent Index - EP 1052414 A1

EP 1052414 A1 2000-11-15 - Fluid valve especially for hydraulic servocontrol

Title (en)

Fluid valve especially for hydraulic servocontrol

Title (de)

Fluidventilvorrichtung, insbesondere für hydraulische Fernsteuerung

Title (fr)

Dispositif distributeur de fluide notamment pour télécommande hydraulique

Publication

EP 1052414 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401265 A

Priority

FR 9906088 A

Abstract (en)

Active part (10) of plunger (3) has part (24) of its periphery with smaller radius along angular section, and with sufficien axial length so that, when plunger is moved from resting position, passage is created, between chamber (12) receiving fluid (P) other chamber (13), through gap (26) defined by part and bore (9) once that radial aperture (23) of channel (22) is closed up by wall of bore.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif distributeur de fluide, notamment pour télécommande hydraulique, comprenant au moins un réducteur de pression (2) monté dans un corps (1) et un organe de commande (19) propre à modifier le tarage du réducteur, lequel réducteur (2) comporte un plongeur (3) comportant une partie active (10) déplaçable dans un alésage (9) communiquant axialement avec une chambre (13) de départ du fluide (D) de télécommande et, latéralement, avec une chambre (12) alimentée en fluide sous pression (P) ; au moins une portion de la périphérie de la partie active (10) du plongeur a un rayon moindre sur au moins un secteur angulaire et une longueur axiale suffisante pour que, lorsque le plongeur est déplacé à partir de sa position de repos, un passage soit établi, entre une chambre (12) recevant le fluide d'alimentation (P) et une chambre (13) recevant le fluide de départ (D), à travers l'intervalle (26) défini par la portion (24) de rayon moindre et l'alésage (9) après que l'orifice radial (23) d'un canal (22) intérieur au plongeur ait été obturé par la paroi de l'alésage (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 11/07 (2006.01); F15B 11/08 (2006.01); F15B 13/042 (2006.01); G05D 16/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0422 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052414 A1 20001115; EP 1052414 B1 20040407; AT 263929 T 20040415; DE 60009598 D1 20040513; DE 60009598 T2 20050609; FR 2793532 A1 20001117; FR 2793532 B1 20010803; JP 2000357016 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100509

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100509

2011-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100510

2011-02-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100509

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100509

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090505

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090512

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090523

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-09-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH

2004-08-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: REXROTH S.A.

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009598 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2004-04-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI