Global Patent Index - EP 1052446 A2

EP 1052446 A2 2000-11-15 - Vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1052446 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109699 A

Priority

DE 19921907 A

Abstract (en)

The head lamp has a shell-shaped reflector (1), a light source (2) associated with the reflector, an aperture shaft (4) betw a lens and the reflector, a drive mechanism coupled to the aperture shaft to move the shaft into various angle settings and a hold for the aperture shaft and drive mechanism. A screen (8) mounted beneath the shaft forms the holder, whereby the shaft is mounte with one section in an upwardly open bearer channel (9) of the screen, which has a holding element (10) for the drive mechanism.

Abstract (de)

Der Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge weist einen schalenförmigen Reflektor (1) auf, zwischen dem und einer Linse (3) eine Blendenwelle (4) angeordnet ist. Die Blendenwelle (4) ist mit einem Antriebsmittel (5) gekoppelt, durch welches die Blendenwelle (4) um eine horizontale und quer zur optischen Achse (6) verlaufende Drehachse (7) in mehrere Drehstellungen verstellbar ist. Die Blendenwelle (4) ist in einer nach oben geöffneten Aufnahmerinne (9) eines unterhalb der Blendenwelle (4) verlaufenden Abschatters (8) angeordnet. An der Aufnahmerinne (9) ist die Blendenwelle (4) und ein Antriebsmittel (5) für die Blendenwelle (4) gehaltert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 14/08 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1794 (2013.01); F21S 48/155 (2013.01); F21W 2101/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4335286 A1 19940428 - KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052446 A2 20001115; EP 1052446 A3 20020313; EP 1052446 B1 20040225; DE 19921907 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-12-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50005376 P 20040401

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-01-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/10 A, 7F 21V 14/08 B, 7F 21W 101:10 Z

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI