Global patent index - EP 1052449 A2

EP 1052449 A2 2000-11-15 - Vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicules

Publication

EP 1052449 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109700 A

Priority

DE 19921511 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp has a shell-shaped reflector (1), a light source (2) associated with the reflector, a lens (3) arranged in the light path of the reflector to collect light reflected from the reflector with a convex side (4) remote from the reflector and a stop enclosing the lens. The stop is in the form of a fill-in reflector (5) for collecting the light (7) from the light source that f encloses the lens and has a focal region associated with the lens.

Abstract (de)

Der Scheinwerfer weist einen schalenförmigen Reflektor (1) auf, dem eine Lichtquelle (2) zugeordnet ist. In dem Strahlengang des Reflektors (1) ist eine Linse (3) angeordnet, welche eine dem Reflektor (1) abgewandte konvexe Seite (4) aufweist und das von dem Reflektor (1) reflektierte Licht sammelt. Die Linse (3) ist von einer Sichtblende umgeben, welche zusätzlich als Aufhellreflektor (5) dient. Der Aufhellreflektor (5) umgibt die Linse (3) vollständig, weist einen der Linse (3) zugeordneten Brennbereich auf und sammelt von der Linse (3) abgelenkte Lichtanteile der Lichtquelle (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1258 (2013.01); F21S 48/137 (2013.01); F21S 48/1388 (2013.01); F21S 48/1376 (2013.01); F21W 2101/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052449 A2 20001115; EP 1052449 A3 20030129; EP 1052449 B1 20040825; AT 274673 T 20040915; DE 19921511 A1 20001116; ES 2224958 T3 20050316

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160412

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120509

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120508

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110617

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-07-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224958

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-12-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50007538

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI