Global Patent Index - EP 1052452 A1

EP 1052452 A1 2000-11-15 - Luminaire having an elongate shape

Title (en)

Luminaire having an elongate shape

Title (de)

Langgestreckte Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire de forme allongée

Publication

EP 1052452 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00201585 A

Priority

FR 9906017 A

Abstract (en)

The light fitting has a top cover (1) open at the bottom, with a flat plate (4) fitting into the opening. This plate carries lamp components (7,9,10). The long edges of the plate has profiles (3) that engage in a lip on supports (8L,8R) extending down from t cover. The end of these supports has a support (6) that holds one edge of the plate when it is swung down to access the lamp interior.

Abstract (fr)

Luminaire de forme allongée comprenant une toiture (1), et une platine allongée (4) portant des éléments fonctionnels internes (7, 9, 10) du luminaire. Chacun des bords longitudinaux de la platine (4) est pourvu de parties d'appui (3) tournées vers l'intérieur de la toiture quand la platine est en position normale d'utilisation, et la toiture est munie de crochets (8L, 8R) en regard des parties d'appui (3), crochets possédant chacun une partie de soutien (6) destinée à supporter la partie d'appui (3) lorsque la platine est ouverte. Applications : éclairage <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 17/00; F21V 23/00; F21W 131/103

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/08 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/107 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 1028688 B 19580424 - SCHNEIDER & CO DR ING

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052452 A1 20001115; EP 1052452 B1 20071010; DE 60036662 D1 20071122; DE 60036662 T2 20080703; US 6439741 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60036662

2017-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2016-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161006 AND 20161012

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2016-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-01-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60036662

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60036662

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080121

2007-12-27 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071204

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036662 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI