Global Patent Index - EP 1052452 B1

EP 1052452 B1 2007-10-10 - Luminaire having an elongate shape

Title (en)

Luminaire having an elongate shape

Title (de)

Langgestreckte Leuchte

Title (fr)

Luminaire de forme allongée

Publication

EP 1052452 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00201585 A

Priority

FR 9906017 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052452A1] The light fitting has a top cover (1) open at the bottom, with a flat plate (4) fitting into the opening. This plate carries lamp components (7,9,10). The long edges of the plate has profiles (3) that engage in a lip on supports (8L,8R) extending down from t cover. The end of these supports has a support (6) that holds one edge of the plate when it is swung down to access the lamp interior.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/08 (2006.01); F21V 17/10 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01); F21W 131/103 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/107 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052452 A1 20001115; EP 1052452 B1 20071010; DE 60036662 D1 20071122; DE 60036662 T2 20080703; US 6439741 B1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60036662

2017-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2016-11-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20161006 AND 20161012

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2016-03-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2015-01-02 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20141126

2015-01-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60036662

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIPS LIGHTING HOLDING B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL

- Document: DE 60036662

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-05-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20140328

2014-03-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60036662

- Representative's name: VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080711

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080121

2007-12-27 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071204

2007-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60036662 P 20071122

2007-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2007-10-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI