Global patent index - EP 1052468 A3

EP 1052468 A3 2000-12-13 - Plate-like heat exchanger, more particularly oil cooler

Title (en)

Plate-like heat exchanger, more particularly oil cooler

Title (de)

Plattenwärmetauscher, insbesondere Ölkühler

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à plaques, en particulier refroidisseur d'huile

Publication

EP 1052468 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00890123 A

Priority

AT 83799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052468A2] The plate heat exchanger, and especially as an oil cooler, has a number of heat exchanger plates (2) with end members (3) forming a flow trough (1) to give lateral flow channels (6,7) with inflow and outflow connections (12-15) for the medium to be cooled. A least the flow channel (6) at the inflow side is divided axially by at least one dividing wall (16) for one of the media to be cooled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 9/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052468 A2 20001115; EP 1052468 A3 20001213; AT 411624 B 20040325; AT A83799 A 20030815

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI