Global Patent Index - EP 1052470 A3

EP 1052470 A3 2000-12-13 - Attachment for the bleeding of propellant gas from a gun barrel

Title (en)

Attachment for the bleeding of propellant gas from a gun barrel

Title (de)

Aufsatzvorrichtung für die Gasabnahme einer automatischen Waffe

Title (fr)

Garniture pour l'évacuation des gaz de combustion d'un tube de canon

Publication

EP 1052470 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00108484 A

Priority

DE 19921804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052470A2] The attachment (1) for the gas extraction, at an automatic weapon, reduces the cross section of the gas escape opening (7) a the gas extractor (4). The effect is to increase the gas pressure within the gas extractor (4) generated by the ignition of the powd propellant charge. The structure increases the gas pressure, when using lightweight practice ammunition, to force the gas piston sufficiently to the rear for a fresh round to be loaded automatically into the breech.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 5/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 5/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 5/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052470 A2 20001115; EP 1052470 A3 20001213; DE 19921804 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI