Global Patent Index - EP 1052471 A1

EP 1052471 A1 2000-11-15 - Fragmentation type projectile in which the fragments are created by a hollow charge effect

Title (en)

Fragmentation type projectile in which the fragments are created by a hollow charge effect

Title (de)

Splittermunition, in der die Splitter mittels Hohlladungen hergestellt werden

Title (fr)

Munition explosive à éclats contrôlés formés par explosif

Publication

EP 1052471 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401293 A

Priority

FR 9906163 A

Abstract (en)

The explosive device consists of a detonator head, an explosive charge (4) of about 90g of hexolite or tolite, a plastic out shell (1), and an inner wall (7) e.g. of copper or aluminum which creates the fragments. The inner wall is in contact with the explosive and is made up of a series of conical, spherical or pyramidal concave sections, each measuring between 2.5 and 5.5 mm across at the base, with a wall thickness of 0.5 - 0.8 mm and an angle of 90 - 140 degrees. The outer plastic shell is sufficien supple not to attenuate the energy released by the explosive charge and sufficiently strong to protect the inner wall during transport.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une munition explosive à éclats formés par explosif (11) comportant une tête de mise à feu, une charge explosive (4), une partie génératrice d'éclats (7), et une paroi (7) au contact de l'explosif qui comprend un ensemble de portions concaves (11) constituant des empreintes s'étendant vers l'intérieur de la munition, chacune de ces empreintes (11) présentant une géométrie adaptée pour constituer avec la charge explosive à son contact une charge formée du type charge creuse ou charge génératrice de noyau, caractérisé en ce que la partie génératrice d'éclats (7) est formée par une unique paroi, qui est celle (7) qui est au contact de l'explosif. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2807309 C1 19870723 - MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052471 A1 20001115; EP 1052471 B1 20040728; DE 60012413 D1 20040902; DE 60012413 T2 20050804; ES 2222883 T3 20050216; FR 2793551 A1 20001117; FR 2793551 B1 20020531

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080512

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080512

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080511

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080511

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070418

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222883 T3

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012413 P 20040902

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI