Global Patent Index - EP 1052502 A9

EP 1052502 A9 2001-04-25 - NONCONTACT ARTICLE TEMPERATURE MEASURING DEVICE FOR FOOD

Title (en)

NONCONTACT ARTICLE TEMPERATURE MEASURING DEVICE FOR FOOD

Title (de)

BERÜHRUNGSLOSER TEMPERATURMESSFÜHLER FÜR NAHRUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF MESURANT LA TEMPERATURE D'UN ARTICLE ALIMENTAIRE SANS CONTACT

Publication

EP 1052502 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 99940614 A

Priority

  • JP 9904749 W
  • JP 24787598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0014522A1] A noncontact article temperature measuring device adapted for evaluating the quality including the food temperature, freezed/thawed state, presence/absence of bubble based on food capacitance measurement data and for evaluating/controlling the operation of a thawing device and used for a freezing/thawing system so as to solve conventional problems. The measuring device is so provided that an article of food can be passed or is provided on both vertical sides of a space or on the same plane of one of the sides. The measuring device comprises at least a pair of electrodes serving as a capacitance sensor and a capacitance measuring section for measuring the capacitance of the food article placed in the space from the signal generated by the paired electrodes. The capacitance is measured by applying a predetermined voltage between the electrodes, and the temperature of the article is determined and the freezed/thawed state is recognized from the measured capacitance. The voltage applied to the plus electrode is preferably a high-frequency voltage the frequency of which ranges from 50 kHz to 1 MHz. A guard electrode for preventing lines of electric force from diffusing surrounds the plus electrode at an insulation distance is preferably provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/22; G01K 7/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01K 7/34 (2006.01); G01N 27/22 (2006.01); G01N 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/02 (2013.01); G01K 7/343 (2013.01); G01N 27/221 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0014522 A1 20000316; WO 0014522 A8 20000608; AU 5447199 A 20000327; AU 763584 B2 20030724; CA 2308212 A1 20000316; CA 2308212 C 20071113; EP 1052502 A2 20001115; EP 1052502 A4 20030226; EP 1052502 A9 20010425; JP 4121707 B2 20080723; US 6242714 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090401

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071108

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT NL

2003-02-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030114

2001-04-25 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE