Global Patent Index - EP 1052521 A1

EP 1052521 A1 2000-11-15 - Compensation of radiation damping during selective pulses in NMR spectroscopy

Title (en)

Compensation of radiation damping during selective pulses in NMR spectroscopy

Title (de)

Kompensation von Strahlungsdämpfung während selektiver Pulse in der Kernspinresonanzspektroskopie

Title (fr)

Compensation de l'amortissement de radiation pendant des impulsions sélectives dans la spectroscopie à RMN

Publication

EP 1052521 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99108737 A

Priority

EP 99108737 A

Abstract (en)

A method for compensating radiation damping (=RD) effects during selective or non-selective radio frequency (=rf) pulses in nuclear magnetic resonance (=NMR) spectroscopy comprises the following steps: 1) Choose an rf pulse suitably shaped for a selective or non-selective excitation, inversion or refocussing experiment and calculate the expected transverse magnetisation <MATH> where i = <SQRT>-1</SQRT> by solving the Bloch equations on-resonance, assuming that there is no RD; 2) Calibrate the rf amplitude on-resonance on a sample with little RD; 3) Estimate the RD rate <MATH> for a sample with RD, where gamma is the gyromagnetic ratio, eta is the filling factor, Q is the quality factor and M0 is the equilibrium magnetisation; 4) Define a compensated rf pulse shape using the estimate of step 3), given by <MATH> where i = <SQRT>-1</SQRT> , omega +<unc)<t) is the ordinary uncompensated shape of the selective or non-selective rf pulse and M+(t) is the time dependent transverse magnetisation; 5) Record the on-resonance response for the said selective or non-selective excitation, inversion or refocussing experiment. This method has general applicability for any amplitude or frequency modulated rf pulse and presents a general way to compensate for radiation damping during the application of selective rf pulses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 33/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 33/446 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] W.S.WARREN ET AL.: "Dynamics of radiation damping in nuclear magnetic resonance", J.CHEM.PHYS., vol. 91, no. 10, 1989, pages 5895 - 5904, XP002116030

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052521 A1 20001115; EP 1052521 B1 20041020; DE 69921298 D1 20041125; DE 69921298 T2 20051027

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921298 P 20041125

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRUKER BIOSPIN AG

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEN, JIN HONG, DR.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JERSCHOW, ALEXEJ, DR.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BODENHAUSEN, GEOFFREY, PROF.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHEN, JIN HONG, DR.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JERSCHOW, ALEXEJ, DR.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RODENHAUSEN, GEOFFREY, PROF.

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI