Global Patent Index - EP 1052603 A9

EP 1052603 A9 2002-09-04 - Cashless transactions without credit cards, debit cards or checks

Title (en)

Cashless transactions without credit cards, debit cards or checks

Publication

EP 1052603 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00107413 A

Priority

US 29910299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052603A2] Cashless transactions are performed by transmitting information identifying a purchaser of a product without identifying a payment account for the purchaser. The transmitted identifying information is received at a central processing point and processed to determine if the purchaser is a registered purchaser. A notice confirming registration, which may take the form of a purchase authorization, is transmitted from the central processing point if the purchaser is determined to be registered. The transmitted notice is received at the point of purchase and a bill is generated for the purchased product responsive to receipt of the notice. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/02 (2012.01); G06Q 20/04 (2012.01); G06Q 20/10 (2012.01); G06Q 30/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/02 (2013.01); G06Q 20/04 (2013.01); G06Q 20/10 (2013.01)

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052603 A2 20001115; EP 1052603 A3 20010613; EP 1052603 A9 20020904; AU 2889100 A 20001116; CA 2305233 A1 20001026; US 2004139005 A1 20040715; US 6678664 B1 20040113; ZA 200001929 B 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI