Global Patent Index - EP 1052605 A3

EP 1052605 A3 2001-04-18 - Device for panoramic viewing, especially of extensive public areas

Title (en)

Device for panoramic viewing, especially of extensive public areas

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur panoramischen Ansicht, insbesondere von öffentlichen Lokalen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour visualisation panoramique, notamment des lieux publics

Publication

EP 1052605 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00201640 A

Priority

IT MI991033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1052605A2] A device (11) for panoramic viewing, especially of extensive public areas, comprising a box-type unit (12-16) housing a multiple number of fixtures for acquiring images (20, 22) which are facing towards through holes (21, 23) provided along a perimeter of the body (12-16) for viewing outside the same body (12-16), where such fixtures (20, 22) are associated with a control circuit (24), a feeder (25) and a coupling circuit (27) to an antenna (28), so that the images captured by each of these fixtures (20, 22) may be transmitted to a control center. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 15/00; G08B 13/196

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/196 (2006.01); G08B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19697 (2013.01); G08B 13/19636 (2013.01); G08B 13/19641 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052605 A2 20001115; EP 1052605 A3 20010418; EP 1052605 B1 20030827; DE 60004724 D1 20031002; DE 60004724 T2 20040617; IT 1312486 B1 20020417; IT MI991033 A1 20001113

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111007

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2005-05-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050508

2004-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040508

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040508

2003-12-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60004724 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 15/00 A, 7G 08B 13/196 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI