Global Patent Index - EP 1052607 A1

EP 1052607 A1 2000-11-15 - Method and device for parametering a security system

Title (en)

Method and device for parametering a security system

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Parametrierung einer Sicherheitsanlage

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour paramètrer un système de sécurité

Publication

EP 1052607 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99109160 A

Priority

EP 99109160 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves entering the desired parameters into a PC (9) at any point and setting the PC into a standby mode, then transmitting the parameters and settings from the PC to the central station (1) via a communications connection after finishing the hardware configuration of the security system. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Die gewünschten Parameter werden an einem beliebigen Ort in einen PC (9) eingegeben und dieser wird in einen Bereitschaftsmodus gebracht. Nach Abschluss der hardwaremässigen Konfiguration der Sicherheitsanlage werden über eine Kommunikationsverbindung (8) die Parameter und Einstellungen vom PC (9) an die Zentrale (1) übertragen. Die Kommunikationsverbindung zwischen dem PC (9) und der Zentrale (1) wird von der Zentrale (1) hergestellt und die Übertragung an die Zentrale (1) erfolgt autonom. Die Kommunikationsverbindung ist beispielsweise durch ein öffentliches Übertragungsnetz, vorzugsweise das Telefonnetz gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 26/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052607 A1 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20031019

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020923

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI