Global Patent Index - EP 1052614 A2

EP 1052614 A2 2000-11-15 - Method and apparatus for driving a display device

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for driving a display device

Title (de)

Vefahren und Einrichtung zum Steuern einer Anzeige

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de commande d'un dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1052614 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304064 A

Priority

  • JP 13489999 A
  • JP 2000067638 A

Abstract (en)

A display driving device drives a display which includes a plurality of actuators which control light emitted from specified parts of an optical wave guide plate. A first drive circuit controls the row electrodes, while a second drive circuit controls the column electrodes by outputting a data signal. The data signal includes a light emitting signal and a light extinguishing signal for each dot in the display, based on an input image signal. The column electrode drive circuit controls gradation only by a temporal modulation method. A signal processing circuit, which controls the first and second drive circuits, also controls brightness correction data. Brightness correction data are determined upon manufacture of the display and can be modified during the life of the display to correct for brightness deterioration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09G 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/20 (2006.01); G09G 3/34 (2006.01); G09G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/3473 (2013.01); G09G 3/3406 (2013.01); G09G 3/3493 (2013.01); G09G 3/2014 (2013.01); G09G 3/2022 (2013.01); G09G 3/2025 (2013.01); G09G 5/10 (2013.01); G09G 2300/026 (2013.01); G09G 2310/02 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0224 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0235 (2013.01); G09G 2310/0275 (2013.01); G09G 2310/06 (2013.01); G09G 2310/061 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0276 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0285 (2013.01); G09G 2320/029 (2013.01); G09G 2320/041 (2013.01); G09G 2320/043 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0633 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0646 (2013.01); G09G 2330/02 (2013.01); G09G 2360/16 (2013.01); G09G 2380/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052614 A2 20001115; EP 1052614 A3 20030716

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050218

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-04-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI