Global Patent Index - EP 1052652 A2

EP 1052652 A2 2000-11-15 - X-rays protection garment

Title (en)

X-rays protection garment

Title (de)

Röntgenschutzbekleidung

Title (fr)

Vêtement de protection contre les rayons X

Publication

EP 1052652 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105886 A

Priority

DE 19922140 A

Abstract (en)

The protective clothing (1) against X-rays, made of a material capable of absorbing X-rays, comprises a top garment (50) and bottom garment (2). The bottom garment is provided at the back with an elastic tightening belt fastened to it at two points distanced from one another in the circumferential direction relative to the wearer.

Abstract (de)

Eine Röntgenschutzbekleidung (1) zur Abschirmung einer von einer Röntgenquelle abgestrahlten Röntgenstrahlung weist ein Röntgenschutzoberteil (50) und ein Röntgenschutzunterteil (2) auf. Dabei weist das Röntgenschutzunterteil (2) einen elastisch verformbaren in einem Rückenteil (6) des Röntgenschutzunterteils (2) angeordneten Zugbund (26) auf, der an einer ersten und einer zweiten Befestigungsstelle (24, 25) mit einem flächigen, die Röntgenstrahlung absorbierenden Grundkörper (3) des Röntgenschutzunterteils (2) verbunden ist, wobei die Befestigungsstellen (24, 25) umfänglich versetzt zueinander angeordnet sind.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 3/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052652 A2 20001115; EP 1052652 A3 20080305; EP 1052652 B1 20090826; AT 441189 T 20090915; DE 19922140 A1 20001123; DE 19922140 C2 20020418; DE 50015727 D1 20091008; DK 1052652 T3 20100104; ES 2328897 T3 20091119

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140320

2015-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141002

2014-11-27 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090402567

- Effective date: 20141002

2014-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 441189 T

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-10-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140331

2013-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20130319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100320

2010-10-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100527

2010-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090826

2010-03-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091228

2010-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090826

2010-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090826

2010-01-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-12-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2009-11-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090402567

2009-11-19 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2328897 T3

2009-10-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015727 P 20091008

2009-09-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG & PARTNER AG, PATENT- UND MARKENANWAEL

2009-08-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2009-08-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080807

2008-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080707

2008-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI