EP 1052668 A1 20001115 - Operating at high pressure of a field-emission type cold cathode
Title (en)
Operating at high pressure of a field-emission type cold cathode
Title (de)
Betrieb bei Hochdruck einer Feldemissionskaltkathode
Title (fr)
Fonctionnement à haute pression d'une cathode froide à émission de champ
Publication
Application
Priority
FR 9905089 A 19990422
Abstract (en)
[origin: FR2792770A1] The micropoint electron emission generator has a cathode (1) with a number of interspersed micropoint emitters (4-7) and a grid (13). The micropoints are heated (25-28) to maintain them above the ambient temperature, allowing the cathode to function at a higher residual pressure.
Abstract (fr)
Un dispositif de génération d'électrons par cathode à émission de champ (1) selon l'invention comprend un réseau de micropointes (4-7) émettrices d'électrons associées à une grille (13) et portées par un substrat (3) dans lequel sont intégrés des moyens de chauffe (25-28) pour amener et maintenir les micropointes (4-7) à une température d'environ 300°C à 400°C pendant l'émission d'électrons. La cathode peut ainsi fonctionner à des pressions résiduelles d'air plus élevées, sans risque de claquage. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G01N 27/62 (2006.01); G01N 27/64 (2006.01); H01J 1/20 (2006.01); H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 3/02 (2006.01); H01J 41/06 (2006.01); H01J 49/14 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H01J 1/20 (2013.01 - EP US); H01J 1/3042 (2013.01 - EP US); H01J 3/022 (2013.01 - EP US); H01J 2201/196 (2013.01 - EP US); H01J 2201/30403 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] FR 2714208 A1 19950623 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
- [Y] EP 0884762 A1 19981216 - COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]
- [A] EP 0601533 A1 19940615 - RICOH KK [JP]
- [A] US 3887835 A 19750603 - NOMURA SETSUO
- [A] FR 1520972 A 19680412 - BETEILIGUNGS & PATENTVERW GMBH
- [A] US 3786305 A 19740115 - KOMODA T, et al
- [A] US 3786268 A 19740115 - NOMURA S
- [A] DE 2212424 A1 19720928 - CAMBRIDGE SCIENTIFIC INSTR LTD
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 199, no. 506 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
- [A] DAS J H ET AL: "MICROMACHINED FIELD EMISSION CATHODE WITH AN INTEGRATED HEATER", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B, VOL. 13, NR. 6, PAGE(S) 2432 - 2435, ISSN: 0734-211X, XP000558316
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 259 (E - 773) 15 June 1989 (1989-06-15)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 199, no. 802 30 January 1998 (1998-01-30)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
FR 2792770 A1 20001027; EP 1052668 A1 20001115; JP 2000353492 A 20001219; US 6559442 B1 20030506
DOCDB simple family (application)
FR 9905089 A 19990422; EP 00401027 A 20000413; JP 2000116161 A 20000418; US 55156300 A 20000418