Global Patent Index - EP 1052668 A1

EP 1052668 A1 2000-11-15 - Operating at high pressure of a field-emission type cold cathode

Title (en)

Operating at high pressure of a field-emission type cold cathode

Title (de)

Betrieb bei Hochdruck einer Feldemissionskaltkathode

Title (fr)

Fonctionnement à haute pression d'une cathode froide à émission de champ

Publication

EP 1052668 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401027 A

Priority

FR 9905089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2792770A1] The micropoint electron emission generator has a cathode (1) with a number of interspersed micropoint emitters (4-7) and a grid (13). The micropoints are heated (25-28) to maintain them above the ambient temperature, allowing the cathode to function at a higher residual pressure.

Abstract (fr)

Un dispositif de génération d'électrons par cathode à émission de champ (1) selon l'invention comprend un réseau de micropointes (4-7) émettrices d'électrons associées à une grille (13) et portées par un substrat (3) dans lequel sont intégrés des moyens de chauffe (25-28) pour amener et maintenir les micropointes (4-7) à une température d'environ 300°C à 400°C pendant l'émission d'électrons. La cathode peut ainsi fonctionner à des pressions résiduelles d'air plus élevées, sans risque de claquage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 3/02; H01J 49/08; H01J 49/14; H01J 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/62 (2006.01); G01N 27/64 (2006.01); H01J 1/20 (2006.01); H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 3/02 (2006.01); H01J 41/06 (2006.01); H01J 49/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 3/022 (2013.01); H01J 1/20 (2013.01); H01J 1/3042 (2013.01); H01J 2201/196 (2013.01); H01J 2201/30403 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2792770 A1 20001027; EP 1052668 A1 20001115; JP 2000353492 A 20001219; US 6559442 B1 20030506

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030722

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030310

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI