Global Patent Index - EP 1052673 A2

EP 1052673 A2 2000-11-15 - Funnel for television with rectangular section cone portion

Title (en)

Funnel for television with rectangular section cone portion

Title (de)

Fernsehtrichter mit abschnittsweise rechteckigem Parabelbereich

Title (fr)

Entonnoir pour télévision avec cône à section rectangulaire

Publication

EP 1052673 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109772 A

Priority

DE 19922225 A

Abstract (en)

The glass envelope has a cylindrical neck and a parabolic region (3b) between the neck and the main body of the glass envelo provided with a rectangular front screen, with a continuous transition between a rectangular and a circular cross-section within parabolic region and a continuous reduction in the cross-sectional area in the direction of the neck.

Abstract (de)

Bei Kathodenstrahlröhren befindet sich die Ablenkspule für den Elektronenstrahl um den Parabelbereich (3a) des Trichters zwischen Trichterkörper und Trichterhals. Da der Parabelbereich (3a) durchgehend einen runden Querschnitt aufweist, die vom Elektronenstrahl erfaßte Fläche (6) aber rechteckig ist, befindet sich die Spule in einem gewissen Abstand (7) vom Elektronenstrahl. Der Spule muß zusätzliche Energie zugeführt werden, damit das elektromagnetische Feld trotz des Abstandes (7) stark genug ist, den Elektronenstrahl hinreichend abzulenken. Dies führt zu einem erhöhten Stromverbrauch. Der Parabelbereich (3a) weist im Bereich der Ablenkspule einen rechteckigen Querschnitt auf, so daß die Spule sich möglichst nahe am Elektronenstrahl befindet, und in den Anschlußbereichen zum Trichterkörper und Trichterhals hin weist er den gewohnten runden Querschnitt auf. Dadurch läßt sich eine Energieeinsparung erreichen, ohne daß die Implosionsgefahr wesentlich erhöht wird und ohne daß das gesamte Trichterdesign und die gesamte Trichterherstellung umgestellt werden muß. Der Trichter eignet sich für die kostengünstige Herstellung energiesparender Kathodenstrahlröhren, insbesondere energiesparender Fernseher. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/861 (2013.01); H01J 2229/8606 (2013.01); H01J 2229/87 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19922225 C1 20001102; EP 1052673 A2 20001115; EP 1052673 A3 20031015; JP 2000348644 A 20001215; US 6353284 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060516

2006-01-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FUNNEL FOR TELEVISION WITH RECTANGULAR SECTION CONE PORTION

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI