Global Patent Index - EP 1052724 A1

EP 1052724 A1 2000-11-15 - Inductive grid structure

Title (en)

Inductive grid structure

Title (de)

Induktive Gitter-Struktur

Title (fr)

Structure inductive grillagée

Publication

EP 1052724 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401264 A

Priority

FR 9906001 A

Abstract (en)

The structure has an irregularity in its grid spacing to ensure uniformity of optical output, regarding of diffraction effects. The inductive grid structure comprises an elementary mesh (m1, m2) whose edges (c1, c2) are made of electrically conducting wire. The average coverage rate of the elementary mesh is sufficiently high that the structure serves as a screen in a given hyperfrequency spectral domain. At the same time the coverage is sufficiently light that the structure is substantially transparent in a given optical spectral domain. The edges of the mesh (mi, mj) are orientated in a sufficiently irregular manner to ensure that the diffraction energy in the optical spectral domain is more uniform than would be the case with a periodic grill.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne le domaine des structures inductives grillagées, notamment pour fenêtre optique. C'est une structure inductive grillagée comportant des mailles (mi, mj) élémentaires dont les côtés (c1, c2) sont en fil électriquement conducteur, le taux de recouvrement moyen des mailles élémentaires étant d'une part suffisamment élevé pour que la structure écrante substantiellement dans un domaine spectral hyperfréquence donné et d'autre part suffisamment faible pour que la structure soit substantiellement transparente dans un domaine spectral optique donné, caractérisé en ce que les côtés des mailles (mi, mj) sont orientés de manière suffisamment irrégulière pour répartir spatialement de manière plus uniforme que dans le cas d'une grille unique périodique, l'énergie de diffraction dans le domaine spectral optique. La structure inductive grillagée peut être utilisée pour des fenêtres optiques à hautes performances hyperfréquence et optique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 15/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052724 A1 20001115; EP 1052724 B1 20030709; DE 60003753 D1 20030814; DE 60003753 T2 20040603; FR 2793645 A1 20001117; FR 2793645 B1 20010810

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170428

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003753 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI