Global patent index - EP 1052729 A1

EP 1052729 A1 2000-11-15 - Elastic terminal for an electrical apparatus

Title (en)

Elastic terminal for an electrical apparatus

Title (de)

Elastische Anschlussklemme für ein elektrisches Gerät

Title (fr)

Borne élastique d'appareil électrique

Publication

EP 1052729 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400993 A

Priority

FR 9905221 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2792778A1] The spring connection wirer has a conductor support section (2) fixed on a main conductor. A folded loop grip section (3) pushes against the support section. There is a spring stop section (4) inside the folded loop preventing excess spring movement and a section (45) guiding the wire into position at the base of the conductor support section.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une borne de connexion à ressort pour appareil électrique constituée par une pièce conductrice de support (2) se fixant sur une pièce conductrice principale (14) et par au moins un ressort de serrage (3) plié en forme de boucle et pourvu d'une fenêtre de serrage (3d) dans laquelle passe une aile (2b,2c) de la pièce de support, caractérisée par le fait qu'elle comporte une butée de ressort (4) qui est conformée par pliage de manière à se loger à l'intérieur de la boucle du ressort (3) et à constituer à l'extérieur de la boucle des moyens (45) de guidage du fil ( C) qui sont adjacents à l'aile (2b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01H 1/58 (2006.01); H01R 13/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/4845 (2013.01); H01H 1/5844 (2013.01); H01R 13/447 (2013.01); H01R 13/501 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2792778 A1 20001027; FR 2792778 B1 20010518; DE 60042770 D1 20091001; EP 1052729 A1 20001115; EP 1052729 B1 20090819; ES 2329002 T3 20091120; US 6283801 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160411

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160418

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160504

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100520

2009-11-20 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2329002

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2009-10-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60042770

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-10-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-08-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2009-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20081208

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI