Global Patent Index - EP 1052737 A1

EP 1052737 A1 2000-11-15 - Plug connector housing

Title (en)

Plug connector housing

Title (de)

Gehäuse für Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Boîtier de connecteur à fiche

Publication

EP 1052737 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109608 A

Priority

DE 29908277 U

Abstract (en)

The housing comprises metal with a colorable opening (24,26) for a cable connection. A metallic blind stop or a cable holder inserted into the opening. An insert in the opening has protrusions (266) corresponding to notches in the housing. A coding devi (30,36,38) is provided with a cantilever part which stands away from the housing.

Abstract (de)

Ein Gehäuse (10) für Steckverbinder (28) besteht aus Vollmetall. In eine Öffnung (24, 26) des Gehäuses (10) kann ein metallischer Blindstopfen (220) oder eine ein Kabel am Gehäuse (10) haltende und in die Öffnung (24, 26) einsetzbare metallische Kabelbefestigung (226) eingesetzt werden. Eine Kodiereinrichtung (30, 36, 38) ist vorhanden, die ein von der Stirnwand (16.1, 16.2) des Gehäuses (10) wegstehendes Kragteil (30) besitzt. An dem Kragteil (30) ist zumindest eine Haltevorrichtung (36, 38) für ein Kodierteil vorhanden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658; H01R 13/52; H01R 13/58; H01R 13/645

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/64 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01); H01R 13/516 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/64 (2013.01); H01R 13/6581 (2013.01); H01R 13/516 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29908277 U1 19990722; AT 251350 T 20031015; EP 1052737 A1 20001115; EP 1052737 B1 20031001

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20180412 AND 20180418

2018-01-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: INOTEC ELECTRONICS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHMITT, FRED, DE

2018-01-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INOTEC ELECTRONICS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHMITT, FRED R., 74388 TALHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 50003877

2018-01-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50003877

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR.-ING. GERHARD CLEMENS, DR. R, DE

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHMITT FRED

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-09-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040118

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-01-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-01-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2003-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003877 P 20031106

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031001

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010317

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI