Global Patent Index - EP 1052742 A1

EP 1052742 A1 2000-11-15 - Electrical socket

Title (en)

Electrical socket

Title (de)

Elektrische Fassung

Title (fr)

Douille électrique

Publication

EP 1052742 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401222 A

Priority

FR 9905929 A

Abstract (en)

The sockets includes a spring side contact in the slot used to guide the bayonet pins, serving as both contact and retaining spring. The electrical socket comprises a body made of insulating plastic material with a cavity to receive the ferrule of a lamp. ferrule includes a contact pad and two lateral pegs. The socket includes an electrical contact (12) in its base which co-operate with the contact pad of the lamp, and a lateral contact (30) which co-operates with the side wall of the lamp ferrule. The side contact is situated within one of the two grooves (38,39) which receive the lateral pegs of the lamp ferrule. The lateral contac includes a free end which acts against the side of the ferrule, and serves as a hook to retain the bulb which is inserted by axi force.

Abstract (fr)

Douille électrique du type comprenant un corps en matière plastique isolante avec une cavité (4) de réception du culot d'une lampe, ledit culot comportant un plot de contact et deux ergots latéraux, ladite cavité comportant un contact électrique (12) dans son fond destiné à coopérer avec le plot de la lampe, un contact latéral (30) destiné à coopérer avec la paroi latérale du culot de ladite lampe et deux rainures (38, 39) destinées à recevoir les ergots du culot de la lampe, ladite douille (2) étant caractérisée en ce que le contact latéral est disposé dans l'une des rainures (39) et comporte une barrette élastique de contact (30) dont l'extrémité libre est tournée vers le fond de la cavité et est terminée par une surface d'appui (32) d'un ergot du culot. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/432 (2006.01); H01R 13/504 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 33/965 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/46 (2013.01); H01R 4/184 (2013.01); H01R 13/432 (2013.01); H01R 13/5045 (2013.01); H01R 13/5219 (2013.01); H01R 13/582 (2013.01); H01R 13/6271 (2013.01); H01R 33/9655 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052742 A1 20001115; FR 2793611 A1 20001117; FR 2793611 B1 20010622

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-10-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR LAMPS FRANCE

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REAR FRANCE

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010102

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI