Global Patent Index - EP 1052841 A2

EP 1052841 A2 2000-11-15 - System and method for billing in a radio telecommunications network

Title (en)

System and method for billing in a radio telecommunications network

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zur Verrechnung in einem Funktelekommunikationsnetz

Title (fr)

Système et méthode de facturation dans un résau de télécommunications radio

Publication

EP 1052841 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00109336 A

Priority

GB 9911048 A

Abstract (en)

A system (FIG. 2) and method for billing in a radio telecommunications network, comprising: means (HLR) for storing billing class identifier information associated with a predetermined subscriber or subscriber services; and charging gateway means for receiving call information together with the relevant billing class identifier information and for passing the call information to a relevant billing system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 15/00; H04L 12/14; H04L 12/56; H04M 17/00; H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 15/31 (2013.01); H04M 15/00 (2013.01); H04M 15/41 (2013.01); H04M 2215/0164 (2013.01); H04M 2215/32 (2013.01); H04M 2215/96 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052841 A2 20001115; EP 1052841 A3 20031112; CN 1148076 C 20040428; CN 1274245 A 20001122; GB 2350019 A 20001115; GB 2350019 B 20030903; GB 9911048 D0 19990714; US 6463275 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060203

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR IT SE

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 15/00 A

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04M 17/00 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04Q 7/38 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/56 B

2003-11-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 12/14 B

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI