Global Patent Index - EP 1052879 A2

EP 1052879 A2 2000-11-15 - Flat element

Title (en)

Flat element

Title (de)

Flächenelement

Title (fr)

Elément plat

Publication

EP 1052879 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110008 A

Priority

DE 19922395 A

Abstract (en)

The flat element has a plate-shaped component (1) and at least one transducer (2) on the component that is driven by an electrical audio signal to stimulate the component to vibrate flexurally at its natural resonant frequency to form an acoustic multimode resonance radiator. The flat element has a clamping device (3) connected to the component and that holds the component under tension. An Independent claim is also included for a cover element.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Flächenelement mit der Funktion eines Flachlautsprechers. Das Flächenelement zeigt ein plattenförmiges Bauteil (1), das mit wenigstens einem Wandler (2) verbunden ist und das durch den Wandler (2) zu Biegeschwingungen angeregt wird, das dementsprechend in Resonanz tritt und das als akustischer Multimoden-Resonanz-Strahler wirkt. Dabei gibt das plattenförmige Bauteil (1) abhängig von dem dem Wandler (2) zugeführten elektrischen Audiosignal ein dementsprechendes akustisches Signal ab. Das Flächenelement zeigt eine Spannvorrichtung (3), die das plattenförmige Bauteil (1) unter Spannung hält, wodurch ein besonders gutes akustisches Verhalten des Flächenelementes im Bassbereich gegeben ist. Das Flächenelement kann als Ersatz für ein passives Flächenelement, also für ein Flächenelement ohne Lautsprecherfunktion, verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/06; H04R 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/028 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052879 A2 20001115; EP 1052879 A3 20050727; DE 19922395 C1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090613

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

2006-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-07-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-07-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 9/06 A

2005-07-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04R 7/04 B

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BACHMANN, WOLFGANG, PROF. DR.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRUMP, GERHARD, DR.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: REGL, HANS-JUERGEN, DIPL.-PHYS.

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZIGANKI, ANDREAS, DIPL.-ING.

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI