Global Patent Index - EP 1052880 A2

EP 1052880 A2 2000-11-15 - Digital hearing aid microphone

Title (en)

Digital hearing aid microphone

Title (de)

Mikrofon für digitales Hörhilfegerät

Title (fr)

Microphone pour prothèse auditive numerique

Publication

EP 1052880 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306409 A

Priority

  • US 10341598 P
  • US 35267799 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is directed to an improved digital hearing aid microphone with an analog-to-digital converter placed within the integral housing of the microphone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/505 (2013.01); H04R 2410/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1052880 A2 20001115; EP 1052880 A3 20011024

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020425

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI