Global Patent Index - EP 1052914 A1

EP 1052914 A1 2000-11-22 - USE OF AN AIR PERMEABLE PAPER SHEET AS SUPPORT ELEMENT FOR A LAYER OF FABRICS

Title (en)

USE OF AN AIR PERMEABLE PAPER SHEET AS SUPPORT ELEMENT FOR A LAYER OF FABRICS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINES LUFTDURCHLÄSSIGEN PAPIERBLATTS ALS TRÄGERELEMENT FÜR STAPEL AUS TÜCHERN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UNE FEUILLE PAPETIERE PERMEABLE A L'AIR COMME ELEMENT SUPPORT D'UN EMPILEMENT D'ETOFFES

Publication

EP 1052914 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99900973 A

Priority

  • FR 9900115 W
  • FR 9801986 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2774869A1] The invention concerns an air permeable paper sheet as support element for a layer of fabrics (mat) on a production line in particular during the cutting phase. The invention is characterised in that said sheet has in its thickness pores or fine perforations distributed over the whole surface thereof, said sheet having a bulkiness or hand more than 2.5 cm<3>/g, enabling it to allow air to pass through by the suction effect produced from beneath its lower surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41H 43/00; D06H 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41H 43/00 (2006.01); B26D 7/01 (2006.01); D06H 7/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21H 27/02 (2006.01); D21H 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/018 (2013.01); D21F 11/008 (2013.01); D21H 27/02 (2013.01); D21H 25/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940809A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2774869 A1 19990820; FR 2774869 B1 20000414; AU 2061199 A 19990830; CA 2318384 A1 19990819; CN 1124095 C 20031015; CN 1290136 A 20010404; DE 69901236 D1 20020516; DE 69901236 T2 20020822; EP 1052914 A1 20001122; EP 1052914 B1 20020410; ES 2172978 T3 20021001; JP 2002502923 A 20020129; PT 1052914 E 20020731; WO 9940809 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2009-07-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090720

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2008-05-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *AHLSTROM BRIGNOUD

- Effective date: 20060131

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060121

2006-10-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060120

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060121

2006-01-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060120

2005-01-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050120

2005-01-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-23 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-11 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1052914E

2002-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172978 T3

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020401925

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-07-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020710

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901236 20020516

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-10 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020410

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AHLSTROM BRIGNOUD A.A.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AHLSTROM DEXETER SA

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE