Global Patent Index - EP 1052962 A1

EP 1052962 A1 2000-11-22 - COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL OIL/WATER EMULSIONS WITH REDUCED LIPID CONTENT

Title (en)

COSMETIC OR DERMATOLOGICAL OIL/WATER EMULSIONS WITH REDUCED LIPID CONTENT

Title (de)

KOSMETISCHE ODER DERMATOLOGISCHE Ö/W EMULSIONEN MIT REDUZIERTEN LIPIDENGEHALT

Title (fr)

EMULSIONS HUILE/EAU COSMETIQUES OU DERMATOLOGIQUES A TENEUR LIPIDIQUE REDUITE

Publication

EP 1052962 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908833 A

Priority

  • DE 19805918 A
  • EP 9900581 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805918A1] The invention relates to cosmetic or dermatological preparations, containing (I) one or more interface-active substances, selected from the group of (Ia) alkyl glucosides and (Ib) disaccharides esterified with one or more fatty acid esters, (II) one or more interface-active substances selected from the group of (IIa) the glycerol esters of saturated or unsaturated fatty acids, (IIb) the glycol esters of saturated or unsaturated fatty acids and (IIc) one or more fatty alcohols selected from the group of branched and unbranched alkyl alcohols with between 12 and 40 carbon atoms, (III) an aqueous phase, and (IV) between 0 and 5 weight % of a lipid phase, in relation to the total weight of the preparations.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/00; A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/06 (2006.01); A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/30 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/60 (2006.01); A61K 8/92 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/06 (2013.01); A61K 8/062 (2013.01); A61K 8/342 (2013.01); A61K 8/375 (2013.01); A61K 8/60 (2013.01); A61K 8/604 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940886A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805918 A1 19990819; EP 1052962 A1 20001122; JP 2002502866 A 20020129; US 2004037795 A1 20040226; US 7235251 B2 20070626; WO 9940886 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090919

2008-08-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040629

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE