Global Patent Index - EP 1052977 A1

EP 1052977 A1 2000-11-22 - TREATMENT OF CHRONIC INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS OF THE GASTROINTESTINAL TRACT

Title (en)

TREATMENT OF CHRONIC INFLAMMATORY DISORDERS OF THE GASTROINTESTINAL TRACT

Title (de)

BEHANDLUNG CHRONISCH ENTZÜNDLICHER ERKRANKUNGEN DES GASTROINTESTINALTRAKTS

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES INFLAMMATOIRES CHRONIQUES DU TRACTUS GASTRO-INTESTINAL

Publication

EP 1052977 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98907382 A

Priority

US 9802265 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939699A1] The present disclosure relates to an oral formulation for treating gastrointestinal inflammation that includes an effective amount of budesonide suspended in an edible oil, typically a vegetable oil. A method for treating gastrointestinal inflammation in mammals is also described and includes orally administering a composition of this invention to a mammal. In one embodiment, an initial dosage is administered daily for about two to four weeks and the dosage is subsequently tapered, generally at about two week intervals, in response to a reduction in symptoms until a minimum dose that controls symptoms is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 9/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/58 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/58 (2013.01); A61K 47/44 (2013.01); A61K 9/4858 (2013.01); A61K 9/4891 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939699 A1 19990812; AU 6320098 A 19990823; AU 735084 B2 20010628; CA 2320087 A1 19990812; CA 2320087 C 20061219; CN 1149078 C 20040512; CN 1284869 A 20010221; EP 1052977 A1 20001122; EP 1052977 A4 20060712; IL 137598 A 20050925; IL 137598 D0 20010724; JP 2002502812 A 20020129; SE 0002831 D0 20000807; SE 0002831 L 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150129

2014-10-15 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140918

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 47/44 20060101ALI20140904BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/58 20060101ALI20140904BHEP

2014-10-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 9/48 20060101AFI20140904BHEP

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070410

2006-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060613

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE