Global patent index - EP 1052998 A1

EP 1052998 A1 2000-11-22 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING CYTOKINE RELEASE IN RESPONSE TO GENOTOXIC AGENTS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING CYTOKINE RELEASE IN RESPONSE TO GENOTOXIC AGENTS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG VON CYTOKIN FREISETZUNG ERZEUGT DURCH GENOTOXISCHE MITTELN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DE MODULATION DE LIBERATION DE CYTOKINE EN REPONSE A DES AGENTS GENOTOXIQUES

Publication

EP 1052998 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99904568 A

Priority

  • US 9902348 W
  • US 7364098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939720A1] A previously unknown mechanism for cytokine release in response to genotoxic agents, as well as therapeutic and diagnostic procedures and techniques which are based on that mechanism, are disclosed. The mechanism involves the recognition of damaged DNA by DNA-protein kinases and the subsequent phosphorylation of substrates that leads to cytokine release. Methods to modulate the activity of DNA-protein kinases and thus the release of cytokines in response to genotoxic agents are described. Assays for DNA-protein kinase activity which can be used to monitor such modulation are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/70; A61K 7/40; A61K 7/42; A61K 38/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/436 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 41/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/00 (2013.01); A61K 31/436 (2013.01); A61K 38/13 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

A61K 38/13 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939720 A1 19990812; AU 2494499 A 19990823; CA 2319567 A1 19990812; CN 1296413 A 20010523; EP 1052998 A1 20001122; EP 1052998 A4 20030226; IL 137253 D0 20010724; JP 2002502820 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-02-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/436 A, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 7/40 B, 7A 61K 7/42 B, 7A 61K 38/43 B, 7A 61P 35/00 B, 7A 61K 31/435 B

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/436 A, 7A 61K 31/70 B, 7A 61K 7/40 B, 7A 61K 7/42 B, 7A 61K 38/43 B, 7A 61P 35/00 B

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT