Global patent index - EP 1053025 A2

EP 1053025 A2 2000-11-22 - COMBINATION OF A NUCLEIC ACID AND A VASOACTIVE AGENT FOR ENHANCED GENE DELIVERY

Title (en)

COMBINATION OF A NUCLEIC ACID AND A VASOACTIVE AGENT FOR ENHANCED GENE DELIVERY

Title (de)

KOMBINATION EINER NUKLEINSÄURE UND EINES VASOAKTIVEN MITTELS ZUR VERBESSERTEN GENVERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT DE L'ANGIOGENESE PAR TRANSFERT DE GENES ET TECHNIQUES D'APPORT INTRAVASCULAIRE DE GENES

Publication

EP 1053025 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99906814 A

Priority

  • US 9902702 W
  • US 2177398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940945A2] Transgene-inserted vectors are effectively used for in vivo gene therapy for peripheral vascular disease, heart disease and other conditions, by direct injection of the vector into arteries supplying the tissue to be targeted, preferably in combination with a vasoactive agent that is infused into the artery prior to or coincident with delivery of the vector.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/0075 (2013.01); A61K 48/0083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940945A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940945 A2 19990819; WO 9940945 A3 19990930; AU 2663799 A 19990830; CA 2320302 A1 19990819; CN 100350979 C 20071128; CN 101186928 A 20080528; CN 1301181 A 20010627; EA 019099 B1 20140130; EP 1053025 A2 20001122; EP 1695719 A1 20060830; IL 137765 D0 20011031; JP 2002502885 A 20020129; NZ 545047 A 20090531; ZA 9901102 B 20000331

INPADOC legal status

2007-09-14 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033261

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-03-01 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20060105

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020913

2001-01-10 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-12-13 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-12-06 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE