Global patent index - EP 1053063 A1

EP 1053063 A1 2000-11-22 - PILING RACK FOR FLAT PARCELS

Title (en)

PILING RACK FOR FLAT PARCELS

Title (de)

STAPELFACH FÜR FLACHE SENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

CASIER D'EMPILAGE POUR ENVOIS PLATS

Publication

EP 1053063 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907251 A

Priority

  • DE 9900117 W
  • DE 19805562 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805562C1] The present invention relates to a piling rack for flat parcels which is open on one side for withdrawing piled parcels. The rack has a bottom (4) as well as an impact wall (7) inclined outwardly and turning inwardly relative to the cutting edge, wherein a side wall (5) is provided for orienting the piling bottom as well as the piling direction. The parcels are inserted through an adequate opening (1) towards the bottom. The piling bottom (4) is inclined relative to the parcel orientation upon insertion into the piling rack and relative to the impact wall (7) and the side wall (5). The piling rack comprises a lid (8) which is mounted and shaped so that its inner outline extends at least from a curved portion towards the piling bottom (4) below the upper limit of the parcel trajectory. The curve is designed so that when the piling rack is empty, the parcels fall onto the impact wall (7) in a lower region adjacent to the edge directed towards the piling bottom (4), at an angle of between 70 and 90 DEG relative to the upper surface of the parcels and so as to be parallel to said edge. After this curved area, the lid of the rack is curved from the piling bottom (4) so as to be brought into contact with the impact wall (7) within an interval relative to the piling bottom (4) which is smaller than the parcel with the smallest dimensions towards which it is oriented.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/34 (2006.01); B65H 31/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941021A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805562 C1 19990415; EP 1053063 A1 20001122; EP 1053063 B1 20020410; JP 2002502791 A 20020129; US 6612568 B1 20030902; WO 9941021 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080119

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901186

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010710

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT