Global Patent Index - EP 1053077 A1

EP 1053077 A1 2000-11-22 - ABRASIVE-MEDIUM EJECTOR GUN

Title (en)

ABRASIVE-MEDIUM EJECTOR GUN

Title (de)

STRAHLMITTEL-INJEKTORPISTOLE

Title (fr)

PISTOLET EJECTEUR POUR AGENT DE GRENAILLAGE

Publication

EP 1053077 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907398 A

Priority

  • DE 19804233 A
  • EP 9900396 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804233A1] The present invention relates to an abrasive-medium ejector gun (1) which has separate inlets for pressurised air, water and the abrasive medium and comprises an outlet opening (17) for the abrasive medium mixed with the pressurised air and water. In order to provide an improved wetting of the abrasive medium, a first mixing device (24) is used for adding water to the pressurised air, while a second mixing device (19) is used for adding the abrasive agent to the water-pressurised air mixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 5/02; B24C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 5/02 (2006.01); B24C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 7/0084 (2013.01); B24C 5/02 (2013.01); B24C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939874A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804233 A1 19990812; DK 1053077 T3 20030106; EP 1053077 A1 20001122; EP 1053077 B1 20021204; WO 9939874 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903647

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903647

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-08-29 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-10-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021204

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030121

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903647 20030116

2003-01-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE