Global Patent Index - EP 1053078 A1

EP 1053078 A1 2000-11-22 - GRINDING WHEEL WITH LAYERED ABRASIVE SURFACE

Title (en)

GRINDING WHEEL WITH LAYERED ABRASIVE SURFACE

Title (de)

SCHLEIFSCHEIBE MIT SCHICHTFÖRMIGEN SCHLEIFFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

MEULE A SURFACE ABRASIVE STRATIFIEE

Publication

EP 1053078 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964998 A

Priority

  • US 9827756 W
  • US 1965798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9939876A1] A cylindrical, abrasive grinding wheel having a cylindrical abrasive region with an abrasive surface at an outer circular band thereof. The abrasive region includes layers of abrasive particles. The layers of abrasive particles can be tilted with respect to an axis of rotation of the grinding wheel or they can be fitted such that grooving in the grinding wheel and a workpiece ground by the grinding wheel can be reduced. Alternatively, the abrasive region can be formed from a plurality of abrasive segments each having layers of abrasive particles. The layers of abrasive particles can be staggered in the direction of the axis of rotation from one segment to another. This can also reduce grooving in the grinding wheel and workpieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 5/06; B24D 5/10; B24D 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/06 (2006.01); B24D 5/10 (2006.01); B24D 18/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 18/00 (2013.01); B24D 5/066 (2013.01); B24D 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939876A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9939876 A1 19990812; AU 2019999 A 19990823; DE 69826324 D1 20041021; DE 69826324 T2 20051020; DE 69826324 T3 20080717; EP 1053078 A1 20001122; EP 1053078 B1 20040915; EP 1053078 B2 20080102; JP 2002502714 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081228

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081228

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20081228

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-10 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20080102

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-08-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.

- Effective date: 20050615

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69826324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020114

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT