Global Patent Index - EP 1053102 A1

EP 1053102 A1 2000-11-22 - METHOD FOR DETECTING A ROTATION ANGLE POSITION OF MOVEABLE CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR DETECTING A ROTATION ANGLE POSITION OF MOVEABLE CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG EINER DREHWINKELLAGE EINES ORTSVERÄNDERBAREN ZYLINDERS EINER DRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LA POSITION ANGULAIRE D'UN CYLINDRE MOBILE D'UNE MACHINE A IMPRIMER

Publication

EP 1053102 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908753 A

Priority

  • DE 9900231 W
  • DE 19803558 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803558A1] The invention relates to a method for detecting a rotation angle position of moveable cylinder in which the detected rotation angle position is impinged upon with a compensation value at a second position of the cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/004; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/004 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0045 (2013.01); B41F 33/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9938689A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803558 A1 19990812; EP 1053102 A1 20001122; EP 1053102 B1 20011128; US 6327976 B1 20011211; WO 9938689 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900462 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI