Global Patent Index - EP 1053106 A1

EP 1053106 A1 2000-11-22 - NON-TEARING LETTERPRESS PRINTING FORM

Title (en)

NON-TEARING LETTERPRESS PRINTING FORM

Title (de)

EINREISSGESCHÜTZTE HOCHDRUCKFORM

Title (fr)

FORME TYPOGRAPHIQUE ANTI-DECHIRURE

Publication

EP 1053106 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907519 A

Priority

  • DE 19804672 A
  • EP 9900810 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804672A1] The invention relates to a letterpress printing form having a supporting layer (1) and an ink or lacquer transfer layer (2). The invention is characterized in that a protective layer (3) which protects the supporting layer (1) from mechanical damage is located between the supporting layer (1) and the ink or lacquer transfer layer (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 1/12; B41C 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/05 (2006.01); B41N 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/12 (2013.01); B41C 1/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9939916A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804672 A1 19990812; DE 59905735 D1 20030703; EP 1053106 A1 20001122; EP 1053106 B1 20030528; PT 1012239 E 20100302; WO 9939916 A1 19990812

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170302

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905735 P 20030703

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOLEX COATING GMBH

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT